Column Multiplication – 4 digit by 3 digit

Now you are secure multiplying by a 3 digit number you can apply your understanding to use a 4 digit number.

Remember to keep all of the digits in the correct column. Once you have practised by following the video below, try and solve these calculations.

3178 x 546 =

1638 x 343 =

1519 x 236 =

Advertisements

Column Multiplication – 3 digit by 3 digit

Now you are secure multiplying by a two digit number you can apply your understanding to use a 3 digit number.

Remember to keep all of the digits in the correct column. Once you have practised by following the video below, try and solve these calculations.

378 x 146 =

638 x 243 =

519 x 136 =